Sarabia, Vivian Elisa (CPSO#: 72625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2683
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Sarabia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sarabia ( CPSO# 72625 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN ELISA SARABIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARABIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000