Saville, Leyana Renne (CPSO#: 86270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
210 Centrum Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 424-8977
Fax: (613) 424-9075
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leyana Saville Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saville ( CPSO# 86270 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
210 Centrum Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: (613) 424-8977

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEYANA RENNE SAVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009