Sawicki, Jakub Tomasz (CPSO#: 95159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
601 - 89 Queesnway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sawicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sawicki ( CPSO# 104141)
Dr. J. Sawicki ( CPSO# 95159 )

Business Address:
601 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAKUB TOMASZ SAWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013