Sawyer, Marc Robert (CPSO#: 84346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0021
Fax: (519) 783-0031
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Joseph St.
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Canada
Phone: 519-578-2100
Fax: 519-578-2109
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sawyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sawyer ( CPSO# 84346 )

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Phone Number: (519) 904-0656

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ROBERT SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008