Scatliff, Robert Matthew (CPSO#: 94291)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Scatliff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016