Schaefer, Rachel Irene (CPSO#: 76228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 672-8364
Fax: (519) 672-0607
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schaefer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schaefer ( CPSO# 76228 )

Business Address:
314 - 460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 672-8364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL IRENE SCHAEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAEFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003