Schamp, Adrianna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 82979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Malicki, Adrianna Elizabeth (used until: 13 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2226
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Schamp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )

Business Address:
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANNA ELIZABETH SCHAMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAMP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007