Schlenker, Matthew Bryan (CPSO#: 93166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Vision & Research Centre
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Pkwy
Millway Plaza
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Canada
Phone: 905-820-3937
Fax: 905-459-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Bryan Schlenker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schlenker ( CPSO# 93166 )

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
Suite 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Kensington Vision & Research Centre
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW BRYAN SCHLENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLENKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015