Schull, Michael John (CPSO#: 61754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Evaluative Clinical Sciences
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G258 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5388
Fax: (416) 480-6048
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )

Business Address:
Evaluative Clinical Sciences
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G258 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5388


Corporation Name: Dr. Josee Sarrazin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
M-Ground - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4M 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN SCHULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1989