Schwartz, Mandy Sabrina (CPSO#: 77568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4H6
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Basement
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill ON  L3T 7R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 771-7600
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandy Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schwartz ( CPSO# 77568 )

Business Address:
Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C-9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4H6
Phone Number: (905) 303-2700

Business Address:
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill ON  L3T 7R9
Phone Number: (907) 771-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDY SABRINA SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2004