Seely, Jean Morag (CPSO#: 63378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 7-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-8212
Fax: (613) 737-8957
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean M. Seely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seely ( CPSO# 63378 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN MORAG SEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001