Seif, Gamal (CPSO#: 90638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Eye Associates
Unit A2
2330 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 6M1
Phone: (905) 469-6666
Fax: (905) 469-3171
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Seif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Seif ( CPSO# 90638 )

Business Address:
Oakville Eye Associates
Suite A2
2330 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 6M1
Phone Number: (905) 469-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAMAL SEIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014