Sener, Alp (CPSO#: 77678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Div of Transplantation
PO Box 3359
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3352
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alp Sener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sener ( CPSO# 77678 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Division of Transplantation
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 3359
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3352

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALP SENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2009