Serra, Stefano (CPSO#: 90231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11E208
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5049
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 360-6024 Ext. 3129
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2009 to 20 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2009 to 01 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Stefano Serra may practise medicine independently in pathology.