Shahid, Azmeh (CPSO#: 85517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 Lawton Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4V 1Z6
Phone: 4164501294
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 albert street
west parry sound health centre
International sleep clinic
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3306
Fax: (705) 773-4087
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

227 victoria street
youthdale treatment centre
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2390
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )
Dr. N. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 82092 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270


Corporation Name: Azmeh Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Azmeh Shahid may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
            psychiatry.