Shahmalak, Shahzad Zafar (CPSO#: 75612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4900
Fax: (519) 740-4936
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahzad Shahmalak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahmalak ( CPSO# 75612 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 740-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Shahzad  Zafar  Shahmalak may practise medicine indepdently in psychiatry,
            only.