Shalan Al-Gazi, Mohanad Joodi (CPSO#: 85243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Burlington Children's clinic
Unit 10-14
Suit 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905)634-1311
Fax: 905-634-7202
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.J. Shalan Al-Gazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalan Al-Gazi ( CPSO# 85243 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
Burlington Children's Clinic
Suite 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHANAD JOODI SHALAN AL-GAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAN AL-GAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010