Shalby, Moustafa Ahmed Moustafa Moustafa (CPSO#: 89280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-450 BRONTE STREET
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone: (905) 849-3062
Fax: (905) 849-1449
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 QUEENSWAY WEST, SUITE 208
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-3062
Fax: (905) 849-1449
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Shalby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalby ( CPSO# 89280 )

Business Address:
208 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 849-3062

Business Address:
201 - 450 Bronte Street
Milton ON  L9T 5B7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA AHMED MOUSTAFA MOUSTAFA SHALBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012