Sharma, Malika (CPSO#: 86370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 465-0756 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 465-8344
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

119 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-962-7600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Casey House Hospice Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALIKA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011