Sharpe, Michael David (CPSO#: 32475)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael D. Sharpe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharpe ( CPSO# 32475 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room B2-194b
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3030

Medical Records Location

Address: LHSC - University Hospital 339 Windermere Road London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018