Shaw, Danielle Rose Segato (CPSO#: 73779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6362
Fax: (905) 845-3376
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shaw ( CPSO# 73779 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE ROSE SEGATO SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005