Shbash, Iman Ahmed Mohamed (CPSO#: 82345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L9
Phone: (905) 575-0611
Fax: (905) 575-7737
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of General Paediatric
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shbash ( CPSO# 82345 )
Dr. A. Elsharif ( CPSO# 82330 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Medical Bariatric Clinic
100 W 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L9
Phone Number: (905) 575-0611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMAN AHMED MOHAMED SHBASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHBASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 May 2005 to 17 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2008 to 08 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2009 to 08 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011