Shea, Theresa Mary (CPSO#: 96094)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theresa Shea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: NBRHC Ferris Medical Clinic (Only ER/ wic) 50 College Dr, North Bay, ON P1B 5A4
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017