Shin, Hyo Pum (CPSO#: 93708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Yonsei University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2129
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2050 Weston Rd
Toronto ON  M9N 1X4
Canada
Phone: 416-763-1171
Fax: 416-763-0573
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. P. Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shin ( CPSO# 93708 )

Business Address:
5025 Yonge Street
Suite 201
North York ON  M2N 5P2
Phone Number: (647) 846-3777

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
333 Wilson Avenue
Suite 103
North York ON  M3H 1T2
Phone Number: (416) 631-9888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HYO PUM SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014