Shmuilovich, Olga (CPSO#: 89795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Joseph Health Care
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 105
450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Shmuilovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shmuilovich ( CPSO# 89795 )

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Olga Shmuilovich may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.