Sholzberg, Michelle (CPSO#: 89698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab
Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5389
Fax: (416) 864-3055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Sholzberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sholzberg ( CPSO# 89698 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 2-007G Core Lab, Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE SHOLZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOLZBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2008 to 24 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010