Shoppoff, Lina Anne (CPSO#: 91008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1811 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lina Shoppoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shoppoff ( CPSO# 91008 )

Business Address:
1811 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone Number: (613) 590-0533

Business Address:
713 Montfort Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA ANNE SHOPPOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOPPOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011