Shum, Andrew James Ho-Tak (CPSO#: 91233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Fax: (416) 469-6259
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6619
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Shum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shum ( CPSO# 91233 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES HO-TAK SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2012