Shuster, Anatoly (CPSO#: 90099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6431
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Shuster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shuster ( CPSO# 90099 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 21 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 29 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Anatoly Shuster may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic Imaging, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario
                        School  of  Medicine,  in  which  Dr.  Shuster  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Shuster no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.