Siapno, Lia Abigail Feliciano (CPSO#: 93748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Children's Center
570 Westney Road South, Suite 17
Ajax ON  L1S 6V5
Phone: 9057281673
Fax: 9057282961
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grandview Children's Center
600 Townline Rd. S
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Canada
Phone: (905) 728-1673 Ext. 4255
Fax: (905) 728-2961
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abigail Siapno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Siapno ( CPSO# 93748 )

Business Address:
Grandview Children's Centre
17-570 Westney Road South
Ajax ON  L1S 6V5
Phone Number: (905) 728-1673

Business Address:
600 Townline Road South
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Phone Number: (905) 728-1673

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIA ABIGAIL FELICIANO SIAPNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIAPNO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015