Sibbald, Matthew Gary (CPSO#: 81074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 526-7616
Fax: (905) 527-4463
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Kapala & Sibbald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sibbald ( CPSO# 81074 )
Dr. M. Kapala ( CPSO# 86047 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Anaesthesia
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 3M8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW GARY SIBBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBBALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008