Siddha, Sanjay Kumar (CPSO#: 87552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Netaji Subhash Chandra Bose Med College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905)235-5232
Fax: (905)235-5231
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2690
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1366 Yonge Street
#209
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 963-5955
Fax: (416) 963-5612
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

76 GRENVILLE STREET
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.K. Siddha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddha ( CPSO# 87552 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Dermatology
8th Floor, New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 206
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Suite 205
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR SIDDHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013