Sidiropoulos, Michael (CPSO#: 86680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pathology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4340
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-4530
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Sidiropoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sidiropoulos ( CPSO# 86680 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Unit 205 11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3839

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pathology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SIDIROPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014