Silver, Lesley Carmela Ann (CPSO#: 82390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal University of Malta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2597
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Silver ( CPSO# 82390 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY CARMELA ANN SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2005 to 25 Jul 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2005 to 16 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2006 to 16 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2007 to 16 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2008 to 16 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010