Silversides, Candice Kristeen (CPSO#: 74403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
3rd Floor, Room 3-913
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7732
Fax: (416) 586-8269
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Candice Silversides Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silversides ( CPSO# 74403 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue
Room 3913
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 486-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 5N-523
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CANDICE KRISTEEN SILVERSIDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSIDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 1999 to 15 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004