Simon, David Andrew (CPSO#: 82577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1108 Klondike Road
Unit A
Ottawa ON  K1K 0G1
Phone: (613) 255-7468
Fax: (613) 693-1700
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 255-7468
Fax: (613) 693-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

210 Centrum Blvd
Suite 211
Ottawa ON  K1E 3V7
Canada
Phone: 613-255-7468
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Simon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Simon ( CPSO# 82577 )

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Suite 1C
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 255-7468

Business Address:
210 Centrum Boulevard
Suite 211
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: (613) 255-7468

Business Address:
A - 1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 255-7468

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010