Sinclair, Leslie Ann (CPSO#: 98033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Morrison, Leslie Ann (used until: 22 Aug 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NOTE! NOT Dr Sinclair 55576 Toronto
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone: 519-659-3006
Fax: 519-659-8575
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sinclair ( CPSO# 98033 )

Business Address:
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-3006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANN SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014