Singh, Farid (CPSO#: 89919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Singh ( CPSO# 89919 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Farid Singh may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry, only.