Singh, Prabhjyot (CPSO#: 90341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 401
520 ELLESMERE ROAD
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9393
Fax: (416) 673-9394
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

271 Spadina Rd
Toronto ON  M5R 2V3
Canada
Phone: 18665180000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prabhjyot Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Singh ( CPSO# 90341 )

Business Address:
271 Spadina Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2V3
Phone Number: (416) 928-2512

Business Address:
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABHJYOT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Apr 2009 to 03 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015