Sit, Marisa (CPSO#: 76365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
East Wing 7- 472
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5591
Fax: (416) 603-5720
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marisa Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sit ( CPSO# 76365 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 7
472 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5591

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISA SIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006