Siu, Kaitlyn Victoria (CPSO#: 95384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Turnbull, Kaitlyn Victoria (used until: 08 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thorold Family Health Centre
21 Front Street S
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone: (905) 688-6440
Fax: 905 687 1855
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2X 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Siu ( CPSO# 95211 )
Dr. K. Siu ( CPSO# 95384 )

Business Address:
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 357-3644

Business Address:
21 Front Street South
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 688-6460

Business Address:
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAITLYN VICTORIA SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017