Siu, Stephanie Sai-Man (CPSO#: 93116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seniors Health Centre
North York General Hospital
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone: (416) 756-6050 Ext. 8093
Fax: (416) 756-1844
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
420 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Canada
Phone: 9056950901
Fax: 9057633716
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2nd floor
300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Canada
Phone: 4168478940
Fax: 4168478942
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siu ( CPSO# 93116 )

Business Address:
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-6050

Business Address:
Suite 206
420 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2

Business Address:
2nd Floor
300 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SAI-MAN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016