Siyam, Sheima Abdel Magid Mohamed (CPSO#: 82821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

515 Dundas St West-Unit 8
Oakville ON  L6M1L9
Canada
Phone: 9052577988
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheima Siyam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siyam ( CPSO# 82821 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 849-2571

Business Address:
515 Dundas Street West
Suite 8
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 257-7988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEIMA ABDEL MAGID MOHAMED SIYAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIYAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2008