Sjaarda, David Richard (CPSO#: 109157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  18 Jul 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smithville Medical Centre
230 Canboro St
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
169 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

McNally House Hospice
148 Central Ave
Grimsby ON  L3M 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jul 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  David Richard Sjaarda may practise family medicine, at the following
                  locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College:

                  (i)   Smithville Medical Centre in Smithville, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Hamilton  Health  Sciences  -  West  Lincoln  Memorial  Hospital in
                        Grimsby, Ontario; and
                  
                  (iii) McNally House Hospice in Grimsby, Ontario. 
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires three years  from
                  the date of issuance  or  when  Dr.  Sjaarda's  eligibility  to  take the
                  College  of  Family  Physicians  of Canada examination expires, whichever
                  comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Sjaarda's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Sjaarda's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 19, 2018, and will expire on or before
                  July 18, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.