Skelton, Teresa Margaret (CPSO#: 89133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (647) 894-7990
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teresa Skelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Skelton ( CPSO# 89133 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (647) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA MARGARET SKELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013