Skoretz, Terry Gerrard (CPSO#: 72356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
EMA Office Room E1 102
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-170
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Gerrard Skoretz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Skoretz ( CPSO# 72356 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Emergency Medicine Associates
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY GERRARD SKORETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKORETZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003