Skunta, Kristie Jayne (CPSO#: 95495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hogarth Riverview Manor
300 Lillie St N
Thunder Bay ON
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 4Y7
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6001
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Skunta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Skunta ( CPSO# 95495 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6B4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIE JAYNE SKUNTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKUNTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 14 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013