Sladic, Ana-Sabina (CPSO#: 74788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
273 King Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Phone: (613) 549-4515
Fax: (613) 546-4059
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2423
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sladic Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reid ( CPSO# 74761 )
Dr. A. Sladic ( CPSO# 74788 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
JM-5
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
PO Box 34
19 Hospital
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Public Health Unit
221 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1V5
Phone Number: (613) 549-1232

Business Address:
Suite 2
273 King Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Phone Number: (613) 549-4514

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Connell 725
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA-SABINA SLADIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002