Slomovic, Brant Michael (CPSO#: 85095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
G-480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brant Slomovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Slomovic ( CPSO# 85095 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
G-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 22 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANT MICHAEL SLOMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOMOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008