Smith, Kevin Jeffrey (CPSO#: 72430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Silver Medical Centre for Pain Care
4646 Dufferin Street, Unit 9
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 628-6256
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anesthesia
Lakeridge Health - Ajax site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Anesthesia
Lakeridge Health - Ajax site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Clinic 360
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-7360
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7, Suite 200
Toronto ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Uptown Eye Specialists
2180 Steeles Avenue West, Suite 221
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: (416) 628-6256
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Jeffrey Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 72430 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Rogue Valley Health System - Ajax
Department of Anesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
9 - 4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN JEFFREY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003